skip to content

White, Cheryl Lea-Ann

CPSO#: 93407

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Apr 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hanover Medical Associates
118 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 2G9
Phone: (519) 364-2820 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Cheryl White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. White ( CPSO# 93407 )

Business Address:
Hanover Medical Associates
118 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 2G9
Phone Number: (519) 364-2820

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Mar 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHERYL LEA-ANN WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 25 Apr 2012 to 24 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 25 Apr 2013 to 28 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2014