skip to content

Wheatley-Price, Paul Francis

CPSO#: 85877

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Sep 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 Sep 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Manchester Medical School, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70175
Fax: (613) 247-3511 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Wheatley-Price Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wheatley-Price ( CPSO# 85877 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:08 Sep 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 08 Jan 2007 to 05 Mar 2007
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 06 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
CF - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 Sep 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2015 Active
 Dr.  Paul Francis Wheatley-Price may practise medicine independently in medical
            oncology.