skip to content

Weston, William Fenton Douglas

CPSO#: 23462

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: W.F.D. Weston Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Martins Peoples Storage, 42 Terry Fox Drive, Kingston, ON, K7M 8N5, (613)-545-1365
Date Received: 01 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1969
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016