skip to content

Weston, Walter Wayne

CPSO#: 19590

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Jul 1965

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients requesting a copy of medical records may contact: Byron Family Medical Centre 1228 Commissioner's Road West London, ON N6K 1C7
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013


Address: Medical records requests should be forwarded to: Byron Family Medical Centre 1228 Commissioner's Road West London, ON N6K 1C7
Date Received: 03 May 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1969 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013