skip to content

Westenberg, Hendrik Hans

CPSO#: 18954

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 May 2022
EXPIRY DATE
01 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 09 Mar 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French, German

Education: University of Amsterdam, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Records Management Limited
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON  M9L 0A3

Phone: 1-800-775-0093
Website: www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 13 Nov 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1964
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 May 2022

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 1, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr.  Hendrik Hans Westenberg to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 1, 2022:

 

Following public complaints, the College conducted investigations into whether Dr. Westenberg engaged in sexual abuse of patients in his practice. In the face of the investigations, Dr. Westenberg resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)