skip to content

Welsh, Robert Peter

CPSO#: 24163

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Apr 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Apr 2002
Member Portal will be undergoing maintenance between 09:00 pm and 12:00 am on Thursday April 18, 2019. We apologize for the inconvenience.