skip to content

Wells, Stephen Curtis

CPSO#: 29215

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Stephen Curtis Wells Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 5 - Harvey Crt Brantford, ON N38 7W6 519 - 755 - 7190
Date Received: 12 May 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Sep 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017