skip to content

Wells, Malcolm

CPSO#: 91284

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wells Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 26 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:06 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2017