skip to content

Welling, Sean Cannon

CPSO#: 96110

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Apr 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belmont Medical Clinic
Unit 102B
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 894-8800
Fax: (519) 894-5540 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sean Welling Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Welling ( CPSO# 96110 )

Business Address:
564 Belmont Avenue West
Unit 102B
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 894-8800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SEAN CANNON WELLING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELLING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 May 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 May 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2020