skip to content

Welisch, Eva

CPSO#: 89754

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Feb 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Spanish

Education:Free University of Berlin, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Eva Welisch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 24 2020

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Germany
USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Feb 2020