skip to content

Weitzner, Brenda Nicole

CPSO#: 97399

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Dec 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Facul, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5 fairview mall
suite 359
Toronto ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: 416-640-5298 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 102
480 Huronia Rd
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 792-0933
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Suite 359
5 Fairview Mall Dr
Toronto ON  M2J 2Z1
Canada
Phone: (416) 640-5298
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Espanola Regional Hospital
825 McKinnon Dr
Espanola ON  P5E 1R4
Canada
Phone: (705) 869-1240
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Healthwise
12 Morgan Ave
Thornhill ON  L3T 1R1
Canada
Phone: (906) 695-5665
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

2202 Jane street
unit 5
Toronto ON  M3M 1A4
Canada
Phone: 416-249-8000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:15 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRENDA NICOLE WEITZNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEITZNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 30 Apr 2012 to 22 Jul 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Sep 2016 to 05 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2015