skip to content

Weiss, Edward Solomon

CPSO#: 98041

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200-2437 Princess St
Kingston ON  K7M 3G1
Phone: (613) 546-6652
Fax: (613) 344-1365 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Immunodeficiency/AnalDysplasia Clin
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: 416 340 5077
Fax: 416 340 4890
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

220 Bagot St
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Canada
Phone: 613-533-9303
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EDWARD SOLOMON WEISS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014