skip to content

Weisman, Alanna

CPSO#: 93288

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Leadership Sinai Ctr for Diabetes
60 Murray Street
Room L5 024 Mailbox 16
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-8763
Fax: (647) 826-1528 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Alanna Weisman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Weisman ( CPSO# 93288 )

Business Address:
60 Murray Street
L5 024 Mailbox 16
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-8763

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALANNA WEISMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Apr 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014