skip to content

Weisel, Richard Dale

CPSO#: 30103

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Marquette University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Toronto General Hospital Division of Cardiovascular Surgery 4N-464 200 Elizabeth St Toronto, ON M5G 2C4
Date Received: 09 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective:01 Dec 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018