skip to content

Weingarten, David

CPSO#: 26065

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jan 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Shouldice Hospital
Hernia Centre
7750 Bayview Avenue
P O Box 370
Markham ON  L3T 4A3
Phone: 905 889-1125 Ext. 268 Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID WEINGARTEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINGARTEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1978