skip to content

Weind Matthews, Kirsten Lisa

CPSO#: 87215

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Melbourne, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
586 Eglinton Ave E
RRI Imaging
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone: (416) 485-9471 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KIRSTEN LISA WEIND MATTHEWS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEIND MATTHEWS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2014