skip to content

Weidman, Danielle Rebecca

CPSO#: 97958

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Max Rady College of Medicine, University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
Division of Haematology/Oncology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 301
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A5
Canada
Phone: 416-860-6696
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

CHEO
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
Phone: 613-737-7600
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Southlake Regional Health Centre
586 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

610 University Ave
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre, Un
Radiation Medicine Program, Departm
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
Phone: 4169462123
Fax: 4169462038
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology Effective:27 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANIELLE REBECCA WEIDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEIDMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016