skip to content

Wehrspann, William Holt

CPSO#: 27915

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Aug 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2002

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State University of Iowa, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto West Professional Centre
Suite 419
2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Phone: (416) 909-7621 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. W. H. Wehrspann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Wehrspann ( CPSO# 27915 )

Business Address:
Toronto West Professional Centre
419 - 2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Phone Number: (416) 909-7621

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WILLIAM HOLT WEHRSPANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEHRSPANN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2002