skip to content

Weheba, Ihab Mokhtar Mohammed

CPSO#: 94299

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Sep 2010
EXPIRY DATE
01 Sep 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Feb 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ain Shams University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Toronto Lung Transplant Program
Ncsb 11C 1194
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cardiovascular Prevention & Rehabil
County: 
Electoral District: 

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2021 to 23 Nov 2021
PEAP - CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University Of Toronto, 24 Nov 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History