skip to content

Wehbi, Elias

CPSO#: 84725

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2013