skip to content

Weersink, Erin Anne-Marie

CPSO#: 95843

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Westminster Woods Medical Centre
1-33 Farley Dr.
Guelph ON  N1L 0B7
Phone: 519-837-8137
Fax: 519-822-8240 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health and Performance Centre
University of Guelph
JT Powell Building, 2nd Floor
50 Stone Rd West
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Canada
Phone: 519-767-5011 Ext. 1
Fax: 519-821-4007
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Weersink Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Weersink ( CPSO# 95843 )

Business Address:
University of Guelph
John T Powell Building
50 Stone Road West
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1

Business Address:
Westminster Medical Centre
1 - 33 Farley Drive
Guelph ON  N1L 0B7

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIN ANNE-MARIE WEERSINK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEERSINK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2013