skip to content

Weerdenburg, Kirstin Darcie

CPSO#: 96352

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Hospita For Sick Children 555 University Avenue Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 21 Apr 2017


Address: McMaster Childrens Hospital 1200 Main Street West Hamilton ON L8W 3Z5
Date Received: 21 Apr 2017


Address: Kid-E-Care Pediatric Walk-In Clinic Suite 301 491 Eglinton Avenue West Toronto ON M5N 1A8
Date Received: 21 Apr 2017


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:31 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Emergency Medicine Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Nov 2012 to 31 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
CF - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017