skip to content

Weeks, Andrew Stephen

CPSO#: 29498

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jul 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Andrew Weeks Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Weeks ( CPSO# 29498 )

Business Address:
Ontario Diagnostic Cardiology
Unit B1
28 Stonehaven
Cambridge ON  N1S 4V8
Phone Number: (519) 239-7159

Medical Records Location

Address: 30 Country Club Drive Bath, ON K0H 1G0
Date Received: 08 May 2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:17 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:26 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW STEPHEN WEEKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEEKS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1977