skip to content

Wedge, John Hall

CPSO#: 24846

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Hospital for Sick Children 555 University Ave Toronto, ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 01 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Aug 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019