skip to content

Webster, Lindsay Leigh Mary

CPSO#: 99528

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patient to contact office or hospital where seen by physician.
Date Received: 05 Jun 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 23 Oct 2012 to 15 Jan 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2019