skip to content

Webster, David Lloyd

CPSO#: 29976

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jun 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1978
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 675-4714
Fax: (705) 523-7282 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunder Bay Health Sciences Center
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: 807-684-6300
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David Webster Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Webster ( CPSO# 29976 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Health Sicences Center
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6300

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID LLOYD WEBSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBSTER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1978

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 17, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)