skip to content

Weber, Gary Gregory

CPSO#: 31891

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jul 2021
EXPIRY DATE
20 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gary Weber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2008
Corporation Name: Gary Weber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 21 2014
Corporation Name: Dr. Weber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 2021