skip to content

Weber, Elizabeth Anne

CPSO#: 32643

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 84 Trailwood Cres Richmond Hill, Ontario L4E 3L9 Canada
Date Received: 14 May 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:14 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective:22 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020