skip to content

Weaver, Donald Fredric

CPSO#: 33624

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Apr 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Krembil Discovery Tower
4KD477
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-6452
Fax: (416) 603-6274 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Weaver Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Weaver ( CPSO# 33624 )

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DONALD FREDRIC WEAVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEAVER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2013