skip to content

Waxman, Mark Lawrence

CPSO#: 29280

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1977
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 18 Nov 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 07 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 21 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 20 May 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 2016

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Nov 2002
Summary:

On November 18, 2002, Dr. Mark Lawrence Waxman plead no contest to the allegations against him. The Discipline Committee found him guilty of professional misconduct in that he sexually abused a patient, engaged in sexual impropriety with a patient, and engaged in unacceptable conduct. The alleged conduct related to three patients.

The Discipline Committee ordered the following penalty:
 
(i) Dr. Waxman will attend before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded;
 
(ii) Dr. Waxman s certificate of registration will be revoked, such revocation to take effect immediately;
 
(iii) Dr. Waxman will pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00;
 
(iv) Dr. Waxman will reimburse the College for any amount the College may pay, up to a maximum of $10,000 for funding for therapy and counseling for one of the patients (Patient A) under section 85.7 of the Health Professions Procedural Code.

On June 9, 2008, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario considered the application for reinstatement by Dr. Mark Lawrence Waxman, pursuant to Section 72 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, and directed the Registrar to issue a certificate of registration to the applicant, Dr. Mark Lawrence Waxman, subject to the following terms and conditions:
 
(i) Dr. Waxman will have a chaperone present for all professional encounters with female patients. The chaperone will be a registered health professional acceptable to the College and will execute an undertaking which will include keeping a log of all female patient visits.
 
(ii) The College will be entitled to monitor Dr. Waxman s OHIP billings and patient records on a quarterly basis until the re-assessment of his practice as contemplated by (ix) below has been satisfactorily finalized. Such quarterly monitoring to be accomplished by means of submissions to the College of such OHIP billings, patient records and log book as the College shall specify. This provision does not restrict the College from attending at Dr. Waxman s practice location, at other times while clause (i) is in force, to request and review such OHIP billings, patient records and log books as contemplated by this provision to ensure compliance with the terms of his
certificate of registration.
 
(iii) Dr. Waxman will continue to receive treatment from Dr. X, or any other certified psychiatrist acceptable to the College who will provide reports to the College on a quarterly basis for a period of five (5) years from the date of this Order. Thereafter, Dr. Waxman will continue to receive treatment from a psychiatrist on an ongoing basis who will report to the College if he or she has concerns as to Dr. Waxman s fitness to continue in practice. The frequency of treatment shall be at the discretion of the treating psychiatrist but not less than quarterly. Dr. Waxman will comply with all treatment recommendations of his treating psychiatrist.
 
(iv) Dr. Waxman will enter into a five (5) year contract with the Physician Health Program (that is, until 2013).
 
(v) Dr. Waxman will practice in a group setting, under the supervision of a practice monitor acceptable to the College, who will execute an undertaking and who will report to the College on a quarterly basis.
 
(vi) In the event that any of the reports contemplated by this Order are not received in accordance with the time frame specified and if such failure is not rectified within thirty (30) days of notice of the non-compliance being given to Dr. Waxman, the Registrar may suspend his certificate of registration until the report(s) is received.
 
(vii) Dr. Waxman will go through the re-entry to practice program and comply with any requirements or recommendations.
 
(viii) Dr. Waxman will re-enter practice on a graduated basis beginning with no more than twenty (20) hours per week and no more than five (5) hours per day for the first three (3) months of practice.
 
(ix) Dr. Waxman will agree to and cooperate in a reassessment of his clinical practice one (1) year after his return to practice. This will include the College reviewing his billing records and log books. The costs for the reassessment shall be borne by Dr. Waxman.
 
(x) The costs of the chaperone, monitoring and reporting shall be borne by Dr. Waxman.
 
2. THE DISCIPLINE COMMITTEE retains
jurisdiction on the application of a party to vary the terms and conditions of this order.
 
3. THE DISCIPLINE COMMITTEE DIRECTS the results of this proceeding to be included on the register.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 18, 2002

Application for Reinstatement   Download Reinstatement Decision (PDF)
Decision Date: 09 Jun 2008
Decision: Application Accepted