skip to content

Watt, John Alexander

CPSO#: 22488

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Jun 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:04 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008