skip to content

Watt, Andrew James Lilico

CPSO#: 89221

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Ireland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 09 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 24 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016