skip to content

Waters, Braden Earl

CPSO#: 101167

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Critical Care
Medicine
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G2N2
Phone: (416) 340-3601 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Waters Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Waters ( CPSO# 101167)
Dr. K. Janic ( CPSO# 110044)

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Business Address:
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRADEN EARL WATERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Aug 2019
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017