skip to content

Wat, Patrick Cheuk Wing

CPSO#: 31902

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jan 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Jan 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Patrick Wat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: 111 St Regis Cres S Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 or www.rsrs.com or 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 24 Jan 2019


Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record can contact RSRS at 1-888-563-3732.
Date Received: 30 Nov 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Jul 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jan 2019