skip to content

Wassif, Ehab Basha Abd El-Motagally

CPSO#: 88103

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Mar 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Feb 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4421 Queen Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 2L2
Phone: (905) 356-2236
Fax: (905) 356-2568 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne ON  L3K 2N7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

230 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z2
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ehab Wassif, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Wassif ( CPSO# 88103 )

Business Address:
DMH 230 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
260 Sugar Loaf Street
Port Colborne ON  L3K 2N7
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
4421 Queen Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 2L2
Phone Number: (905) 356-2236

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Feb 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EHAB BASHA ABD EL-MOTAGALLY WASSIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASSIF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Mar 2008 to 23 May 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 May 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Mar 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2010