skip to content

Wasserman, Lukas Johannes

CPSO#: 97908

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Stellenbosch, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St Josephs Healthcare 50 Charlton Avenue East Hamilton, ON L8N 4A6
Date Received: 27 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:14 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015