skip to content

Wasserman, David Warren

CPSO#: 92317

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
Walker Family Cancer Centre
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2J 0A9
Phone: (905) 685-8082
Fax: (905) 682-3391 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David W Wasserman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wasserman ( CPSO# 92317 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
St. Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2J 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 682-6451

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID WARREN WASSERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASSERMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2013