skip to content

Wasil, Bushra Iram

CPSO#: 89734

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3691 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON  N8W 1H8
Phone: 13174418351 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Central Walk in Clinic
5415 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON  N8T 1C5
Canada
Phone: (519) 948-5415
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Central Walk in Clinic Leamington
250 Erie St S
Leamington ON  N8H 3C2
Canada
Phone: (519) 398-9395
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Station Mall Walk-In Clinic
293 Bay St
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6A 1X3
Canada
Phone: (705) 450-1715
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Florida
USA - North Carolina

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:08 Jul 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BUSHRA IRAM WASIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASIL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2019