skip to content

Warshafsky, Daniel Alexander

CPSO#: 100241

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
393 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M2
Phone: 416-327-1014 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Physioplus
2489 Bloor St W
Suite 102
Toronto ON  M6S 1R6
Canada
Phone: (416) 760-8280
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Watson Medical
561 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON  M5N1B5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hull-Ellis Concussion Clinic
Toronto Rehab
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

David L. MacIntosh Clinic
100 Devonshire Place
Toronto ON  M5S 2C9
Canada
Phone: (416) 978-4678
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 25 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANIEL ALEXANDER WARSHAFSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARSHAFSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 25 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2015