skip to content

Warren, John Peake

CPSO#: 22149

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Mar 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 30 Mar 1976
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
255 Midland Avenue
Midland ON  L4R 3K3
Phone: (705) 527-2754
Fax: (705) 528-0004 Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1976

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jun 1976 Active
             Dr. John P.  Warren may not prescribe, purchase, or possess narcotic drugs and
            preparations.