skip to content

Warren, Heather Mary

CPSO#: 86288

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 206
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 741-5252
Fax: (519) 741-5772 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Heather Warren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Warren ( CPSO# 86288 )

Business Address:
206 - 430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 741-5252

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:12 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HEATHER MARY WARREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARREN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 04 Jun 2007 to 01 Jul 2007
EL - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 02 Jul 2007 to 27 Jul 2007
EL - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Apr 2013
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2010