skip to content

Warraich, Gunwant

CPSO#: 96689

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 Feb 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Apr 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Sandhu, Gunwant (used until: 09 Aug 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Max Rady College of Medicine, University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2011 to 21 Sep 2011
EL - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Ottawa, 14 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

University of Ottawa, 14 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 13 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Feb 2015