skip to content

Warman Chardon, Jodi

CPSO#: 84791

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Neurology
Mailbox 211
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 16221
Fax: (613) 761-5403 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

CHEO Genetics, C2
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
Phone: 613 737 7600 Ext. 2826
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jodi Warman Chardon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 4 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 24 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JODI WARMAN CHARDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARMAN CHARDON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 12 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 13 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 15 Feb 2011 to 13 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 14 Feb 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 2014