skip to content

Wardle, Andrew Peter Bruce Dannatt

CPSO#: 28327

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sheffield, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Andrew Wardle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 69 Birkbank Drive Oakville, ON L6J 4Z1
Date Received: 04 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015