skip to content

Warder, Lindsay Erin

CPSO#: 91121

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: McLean, Lindsay Erin (used until: 03 Aug 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 707 Moss Street Victoria, BC V8V 4N9
Date Received: 06 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Aug 2011 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 2015