skip to content

Warden, Julia Mary

CPSO#: 89209

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
University Centre
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 3944
Fax: (416) 597-7107 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 406
3101 Bloor Street W
Toronto ON  M8X 2W2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Omega Medical Associates
255 Consumers Rd, Suite 100
North York ON  M2J 1R4
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JULIA MARY WARDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARDEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2013