skip to content

Ward, Richard

CPSO#: 89247

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Blood Disorders Program
9NU994
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5233
Fax: (416) 340-3799 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Richard Ward Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ward ( CPSO# 89247 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Haematology
9N994
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5233

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective:16 Nov 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Sep 2008
PEAP - CF - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 16 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 May 2010
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Nov 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Nov 2017 Active
             Dr. Richard Ward may practise medicine independently in hematology.