skip to content

Wannan, Barry Winston

CPSO#: 21342

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 229
31 Nova Scotia Walk
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1Y9
Phone: (705) 848-3673
Fax: (705) 848-3449 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Barry W. Wannan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 17 2010
Corporation Name: Barry W. Wannan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wannan ( CPSO# 21342 )

Business Address:
Elliot Lake Family Health Team
Suite 229
31 Nova Scotia Walk
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1Y9
Phone Number: (705) 848-3673

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BARRY WINSTON WANNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANNAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1968
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2009
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Sep 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2020