skip to content

Wang, Zixi

CPSO#: 100687

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jan 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Westmount Family Physicians
Westmount Shopping Centre
254-785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone: (226) 272-0272 Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZIXI WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2016