skip to content

Wang, Yongdong

CPSO#: 86137

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Taishan Medical College, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Health Science
Center
Department of Radiology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75182
Fax: (905) 521-1390 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Yongdong Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 27 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:01 Jul 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:01 Jul 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 14 May 2007 to 18 Jul 2007
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 19 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2011 to 30 Apr 2012
CF - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 May 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018 Active
             1.    Dr. Yongdong Wang may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Radiology, McMaster University, in which Dr. Wang holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration automatically expires when Dr. Wang no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.